Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Third Party Administrators - Term and Reinstatement of Registration
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 522
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the date on which a third party administrator's registration expires to 2 years from the date of issuance rather than every other June 30; providing that in order for a renewal of registration to be considered made in a timely manner it must be postmarked on or before the date the registration expires; increasing the period of time during which a third party administrator may reinstate an expired registration from 3 months to 1 year; increasing the amount of the reinstatement fee for an expired registration to $100; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/09/2019
Legislative Date
9/09/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/20/2019
Legislative Date
12/20/2019
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {207275/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 522
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/09/2019 9/09/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/20/2019 12/20/2019 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Insurance - Third Party Administrators - Term and Reinstatement of Registration
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {207275/1 Adopted 15
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15
Text - Third - Insurance - Third Party Administrators - Term and Reinstatement of Registration
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 17
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Referred Economic Matters 18
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 522
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Third Party Administrators - Term and Reinstatement of Registration
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-308, 8-308.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:49 PM