Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Counting of Properly Cast Ballots
Sponsored by
Senators Norman, Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Jennings, Reilly, Salling, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a ballot properly cast by a voter who dies before the ballot is canvassed to be counted in full unless a law or regulation requires that it be fully or partially rejected for a reason unrelated to the death of the voter; and making a conforming change.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {734738/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Rey) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Rey) {803726/1 Rejected
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2015 2/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {734738/1 Report Adopted 27
Senate 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27
Senate 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 29
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 31
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 55
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Rey) Adopted 57
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Rey) {803726/1 Rejected 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 58
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Returned Passed 55
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-302, 11-303.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM