Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Purple Line Marketing Act
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration, in cooperation with certain stakeholders, to develop and implement a Purple Line marketing plan designed to generate early interest in and promote use of the Purple Line; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill $500,000 from the Transportation Trust Fund for the marketing plan in fiscal years 2022 and 2023; requiring the Administration, by October 1, 2021, to submit a certain report to certain standing committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/31/2020
Legislative Date
10/31/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Purple Line Marketing Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 10/31/2020 10/31/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Purple Line Marketing Act
Last Updated: 1/31/2021 3:19 PM
Click to return on the top page