Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts – Direct Action Against Automobile Insurer
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an automobile insurance policy issued, sold, or delivered in the State to be construed to make the insurer directly liable, within the terms and limits of the policy, to certain third-party claimants; providing that a third-party claimant has a right of direct action against a certain insurer subject to certain requirements; authorizing a third-party claimant to bring an action against an insurer alone if the third-party claimant agrees to cap recovery at applicable policy limits; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0124 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Direct Action Against Insurer
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2019
Legislative Date
1/15/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2019
Legislative Date
1/16/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2019
Legislative Date
1/16/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {528173/1
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {528173/1
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted (32-14)
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts – Direct Action Against Automobile Insurer
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-16)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary Economic Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Courts - Direct Action Against Insurer
Senate 1/15/2019 1/15/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/16/2019 1/16/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/16/2019 1/16/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {528173/1 39
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 39
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments {528173/1 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Committee Amendment Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 40
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments 41
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 41
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Adopted (32-14) 45A
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45A
Text - Third - Courts – Direct Action Against Automobile Insurer
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (30-16) 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Judiciary Economic Matters 47
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1701, 3-1702, 3-1703, 5-118 )
(   27-1001 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM