Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Regulation of Animals - Dogs
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Animal Control Division of the Department of Emergency Services and Technology in the St. Mary's County government, rather than the county tax collector, to perform specified duties relating to the issuance and replacement of dog licenses and dog tags; and requiring the general shape of dog tags to remain unchanged from year to year.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0108
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Regulation of Animals - Dogs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Regulation of Animals - Dogs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Regulation of Animals - Dogs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Regulation of Animals - Dogs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Favorable Adopted 13
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Second Reading Passed 13
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Regulation of Animals - Dogs
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 15
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 17
House 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Regulation of Animals - Dogs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM