Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Washington County to permit a holder of a Class 3 winery license or Class 4 limited winery license that has been issued a special event permit to sell for on-premises consumption naturally or artificially carbonated sparkling wine not produced by the license holder; and providing an annual permit fee of $1,000.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0354
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {624236/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {293192/1
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Branch) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {293192/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Young, Simonaire and Ellis)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Young, Simonaire and Ellis)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Bromwell, Branch and Miller)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Bromwell, Branch and Miller)
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {624236/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Economic Matters 46A
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {293192/1 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Branch) Adopted 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {293192/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Young, Simonaire and Ellis) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Young, Simonaire and Ellis) 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 House Refuses Recede 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Bromwell, Branch and Miller) 67
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 House Refuses Recede 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Bromwell, Branch and Miller) 64
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   31-102, 31-401, 31-402.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM