Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Requirements and Funding
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Transportation promptly to undertake all steps necessary to complete the design, engineering, and National Environmental Policy Act process and secure a record of decision for the Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project; requiring the Governor to include in the annual State budget an appropriation of $12,000,000 from the Transportation Trust Fund in fiscal year 2022 and $15,000,000 in fiscal year 2023 for certain purposes related to the Project; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0205
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0845 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2019
Legislative Date
10/30/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Requirements and Funding
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2019 10/30/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Requirements and Funding
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:51 PM