Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that certain employees working at a heightened security interest location be paid a certain wage or combination of wages and benefits; declaring findings of the General Assembly; specifying that certain provisions of the Act do not diminish certain collective bargaining rights of certain covered employees; specifying that a certain agreement to work for less than a certain wage is void under certain circumstances; requiring an employer to keep certain records for at least 3 years; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0685
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0062 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2020
Legislative Date
10/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {637473/1
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 10/28/2020 10/28/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {637473/1 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 12:50 PM
Click to return on the top page