Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Erosion Control Measures - Nonstructural and Structural Shoreline Stabilization
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that, except under specified circumstances, specified erosion control measures that qualify for a specified property tax credit authorized against the county or municipal corporation property tax meet specified shoreline stabilization standards; and applying the Act to tax years beginning after June 30, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {749939/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Erosion Control Measures - Nonstructural Shoreline Stabilization
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {749939/1 Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Erosion Control Measures - Nonstructural and Structural Shoreline Stabilization
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Ways and Means 39
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Credit - Erosion Control Measures - Nonstructural and Structural Shoreline Stabilization
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM