Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Exemption From Property Tax and Other Charges and Refunds
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting certain dwelling houses owned by a disabled active duty service member, disabled veteran, or surviving spouse from certain governmental or taxing authority charges; requiring the State, a county, or a municipal corporation to pay a certain refund to a disabled active duty service member, disabled veteran, or surviving spouse under certain circumstances; requiring the State, a county, or a municipal corporation to pay interest on the refund under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1109
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2019
Legislative Date
10/30/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2020
Legislative Date
1/06/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2019 10/30/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Exemption From Property Tax and Other Charges and Refunds
Senate 1/06/2020 1/06/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 1:52 PM