Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Fully Online Distance Education - Registration and Fees
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Higher Education Commission)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing, altering, and adding defined terms relating to the registration of institutions of higher education that offer fully online distance education programs; authorizing the Maryland Higher Education Commission to charge specified institutions a specified fee under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
10/15/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {214734/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 10/15/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/15 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable with Amendments {214734/1 Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Appropriations 46
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 66
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-202.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM