Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Notices - Alteration of Requirements
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that a certain notice required to be sent by an insurer that intends to cancel or fail to renew a policy or binder of private passenger motor vehicle liability insurance or reduce coverage under a policy or private passenger motor vehicle liability insurance be in triplicate; and repealing the requirement that a certain notice required to be sent by an insurer that intends to increase the total premium for a policy of private passenger motor vehicle liability insurance be in duplicate.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/29/2020
Legislative Date
9/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/29/2020 9/29/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Notices - Alteration of Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/15/2021 3:32 PM