Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Facilities – Dialysis Treatment Services – Training (David Selby Dialysis Parity Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a health care facility from providing peritoneal dialysis or hemodialysis treatment services unless the individual performing the dialysis procedure has been trained in the peritoneal dialysis or hemodialysis technique being performed; establishing civil penalties not exceeding $5,000 for each violation of the Act; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0484
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0494 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/03/2020
Legislative Date
10/03/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {737478/1 Adopted
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/03/2020 10/03/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Care Facilities – Dialysis Treatment Services – Training (David Selby Dialysis Parity Act)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments {737478/1 Adopted 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Care Facilities – Dialysis Treatment Services – Training (David Selby Dialysis Parity Act)
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 8 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:36 PM
Click to return on the top page