Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Jennings, Ready, Salling, and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that personal protection or self-defense can qualify as a good and substantial reason to carry, wear, or transport a handgun for purposes of the issuance by the Secretary of State Police of a permit to carry, wear, or transport a handgun.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0541
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0099 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2019
Legislative Date
1/16/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2019 1/16/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM