Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Assessments - Inspection of Property
Sponsored by
Senator Kasemeyer
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of Assessments and Taxation or local assessment office from using aerial or ground level photography or similar technologies in performing its review of real property.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2016
Legislative Date
9/29/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {639633/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {639633/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {803829/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-3)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/12/2016 9/29/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2016 1/13/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {639633/1 46
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {639633/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {803829/1 Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (41-3) 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 51
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page