Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone and Elfreth
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 694
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Clean Water Commerce Account within the Bay Restoration Fund; requiring the Department of the Environment to transfer $20,000,000 from the Fund to the Account for certain purposes beginning in fiscal year 2022 and each year thereafter; altering the authorized uses of the Fund to include certain transfers to the Account; limiting the uses of the Account to the purchase environmental outcomes in support of the State's efforts to achieve the Chesapeake Bay total maximum daily load; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0507
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2021
Legislative Date
1/05/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2021
Legislative Date
1/05/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {854631/1
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {854631/1
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {854631/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation Appropriations
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-39)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 694
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 1/05/2021 1/05/2021 Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 1/05/2021 1/05/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text - First - Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {854631/1 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments {854631/1 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments {854631/1 Adopted 23AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 2/22/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation Appropriations 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-39) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 694
Text - Chapter - Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page