Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Senatorial Scholarships - Awards
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the recipients of senatorial scholarships to hold an award for a fifth undergraduate academic year or for a semester subsequent to a fourth undergraduate academic year if the recipient makes a specified request, is a full-time student, continues to be a resident of the State, continues to be a student at the institution and takes courses leading to a degree, and has exhausted the funds available during the previous 4 years of study; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted (136-0)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/15/2016 1/15/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Second Reading Passed 24
Senate 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 28
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 72
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Second Reading Passed 72
House 4/12/2016 4/09/2016 Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted (136-0) 72
House 4/12/2016 4/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-2) 72
Senate 4/12/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
(   18-404, 18-406, 18-406.1, 18-408, 18-503 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page