Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Court Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program - Extension
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the name of the Courthouse Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program in the circuit courts for Anne Arundel County and Harford County to be the Court Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program; extending to September 30, 2021, the date by which the Administrative Office of the Courts is required to provide a report on the operation and results of the pilot program to the General Assembly; and extending to September 30, 2021, the termination date of the pilot program.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
19A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Court Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program - Extension
Senate 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable Adopted 19A
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Second Reading Passed 19A
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Court Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program - Extension
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 21
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Referred Judiciary 23
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Court Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program - Extension
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2016, 2017 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM