Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant – Failure to Pay Rent – Fee Limit During Emergencies
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a landlord from assessing certain late fees for the failure of a tenant to pay rent under certain circumstances and following certain notice from the tenant; requiring a tenant to provide certain documents to a landlord for a certain purpose; requiring a tenant to provide written notice with each missed rent payment in order to avoid an assessment of certain late fees; authorizing a landlord to reasonably request documents supporting a tenant's claim from a tenant for a certain purpose; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant – Failure to Pay Rent – Fee Limit During Emergencies
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 5:17 PM
Click to return on the top page