Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - High School Students - Graduation and Attendance Credit for Vocational Training
Sponsored by
Senators West and McCray
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a county board of education to award credit to a high school student toward a high school diploma or a postsecondary credential, or both, for one vocational course per semester in a career and technical education program approved by the county board; and authorizing a county board to count toward high school attendance the time a high school student spends during vocational training in a career and technical education program approved by the county board.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0769
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - High School Students - Graduation and Attendance Credit for Vocational Training
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-205.4, 7-301.2 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:51 PM