Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsored by
Senators Cassilly, Gallion, and Jennings
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Transferring the functions, powers, and duties of the Child Support Unit of the Office of the State's Attorney for Harford County to the Child Support Administration of the Department of Human Services; requiring the creation of certain Position Identification Numbers for certain transferred employees; providing for the determination of salary grade and seniority for transferred employees; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0407
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
4
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {707472/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Harford County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Reassigned to Finance 4
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {707472/1 Adopted 25
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Harford County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 27
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Appropriations 28
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 1:57 PM