Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying voting procedures in certain cumulative voting elections; clarifying the term of a certain director of a corporation elected to fill a vacancy; altering the authority of certain holders of stock to take or consent to certain action; altering the circumstances in which certain holders of stock may take certain action or consent to a certain action by delivering a consent in writing or by electronic transmission; clarifying the time by which a parent corporation is required to provide a certain notice in a certain merger; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2019
Legislative Date
1/22/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
19A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Senate 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable Adopted 19A
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Second Reading Passed 19A
Text - Third - Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 21
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Referred Economic Matters 23
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Text - Chapter - Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 2-406, 2-407, 2-418, 2-505, 2-506, 3-106, 3-106.1, 3-113, 3-804, 8-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM