Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the clerk of the circuit court for Washington County to pay $10 of the nonrefundable fee for performing a marriage ceremony to the Washington County Historical Society, Incorporated; requiring the Washington County Historical Society, Incorporated, to report annually to the Board of County Commissioners for Washington County and the Maryland Historical Trust on the use of all funds collected; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0424
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Washington County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2019
Legislative Date
1/22/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Washington County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Washington County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Washington County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee
Senate 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Washington County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Judiciary 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Text - Chapter - Washington County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee
(   2-410 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page