Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Bicycle Safety on Maryland Highways
Sponsored by
Senators Manno and Zirkin
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 836
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Bicycle Safety on Maryland Highways; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations on specified issues related to bicycle safety on highways in the State; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0192
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study Bicycle Safety on Maryland Highways
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {988074/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force to Study Bicycle Safety on Maryland Highways
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {550414/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-11)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Task Force to Study Bicycle Safety on Maryland Highways
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 836
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Task Force to Study Bicycle Safety on Maryland Highways
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Task Force to Study Bicycle Safety on Maryland Highways
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {988074/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Task Force to Study Bicycle Safety on Maryland Highways
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 46
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {550414/1 Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (123-11) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (36-0) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Task Force to Study Bicycle Safety on Maryland Highways
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 836
Text - Chapter - Task Force to Study Bicycle Safety on Maryland Highways
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM