Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - References to Absentee Voting in Communications - Mail-In Voting
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Elections and each local board of elections to refer to absentee ballots as "mail-in" ballots and absentee voting as "mail-in voting" in all communications with voters and the general public; and requiring the State Board and each local board to include in public communications regarding "mail-in voting" a statement that "mail-in voting" is referred to as absentee voting in the Maryland Constitution, the Annotated Code of Maryland, and the Code of Maryland Regulations.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0037
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {214837/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - References to Absentee Voting in Communications - Mail-In Voting
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable 25
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 25
Senate 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {214837/1 Adopted 26
Senate 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
Text - Third - Election Law - References to Absentee Voting in Communications - Mail-In Voting
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 28
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Referred Ways and Means 29
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/25/2020 10:09 AM