Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Cassilly, Ready, Salling, Smith, West, Carter, Hester, Lee, Waldstreicher, Washington, and Zirkin
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties; providing for the composition of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study issues related to the classification of and penalties for criminal and civil violations in the State; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations regarding the current statutory scheme for criminal and civil violations throughout the Maryland Code to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31, 2020; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0542
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {628971/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {628971/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Judiciary 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page