Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Outpatient Services - Off-Site Facility - Rate Regulation
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the hospital outpatient services for which the Maryland Medical Assistance Program must pay according to specified rates, under specified circumstances; altering the date by which a hospital must notify the Health Services Cost Review Commission that the hospital would like specified services to be subject to specified provisions of law; altering the hospital outpatient services for which a hospital may elect to be subject to specified provisions of law; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0373
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/17/2013 1/17/2013 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Second Reading Passed 46
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 49
House 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM