Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs
Sponsored by
Senators Ready, Benson, Edwards, Elfreth, Feldman, Guzzone, Jennings, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lee, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, Young, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to order a defendant convicted of a charge of animal cruelty under the Act, as a condition of sentencing, to participate in and pay for psychological counseling and to pay, in addition to any other fines and costs, all reasonable costs incurred in removing, housing, treating, or euthanizing an animal confiscated from the defendant; and providing certain other fines and terms of imprisonment for certain violations of the Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0135
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Seizure and Removal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {538973/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Seizure and Removal
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {538973/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Judiciary 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs
(   10-604, 10-606, 10-607, 10-608 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page