Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Sponsored by
Senators Waugh, Peters, and Middleton
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for materials, parts, or equipment used to repair, maintain, or upgrade aircraft or the avionics systems of aircraft if the materials, parts, or equipment are installed on the aircraft; and requiring the Comptroller to report to the General Assembly, on or before December 31 each year, the amount of sales and use tax revenue lost from the specified exemption and any change to the number of aviation technicians employed in the State as a result of the specified exemption.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0067
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0014 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {429830/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {429830/1 Adopted 28
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Ways and Means 33
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-233 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM