Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain controlled dangerous substance prescriptions to be dispensed on an electronic prescription; requiring, except under certain circumstances, a certain health practitioner to issue a prescription for a controlled dangerous substance electronically; authorizing an authorized prescriber to issue a written or oral prescription for a controlled dangerous substance only under certain circumstances; authorizing the Secretary of Health to issue certain waivers; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 10:46 AM