Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Budget and Taxation (Senator Conway)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that specified costs incurred by the holder of a tax sale certificate shall be reimbursed on redemption of the property; requiring specified payments for reimbursement to be made to the attorney for a holder of a certificate of sale or the holder of a certificate of sale and not the tax collector; providing that the holder of a tax sale certificate shall be reimbursed $500 for attorney's fees if an action to foreclose the right of redemption has not been filed and establishing that amount as reasonable; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0241
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {219137/1
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {219137/1
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {219137/1 46A
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted 46A
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Favorable with Amendments {219137/1 48
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 48
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Conway) Adopted 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-843 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM