Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Social Work Examiners – Temporary License to Practice Social Work
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Social Work Examiners to issue a temporary license to practice social work to certain applicants who meet certain requirements; providing that a temporary license authorizes the holder to practice social work only under the supervision of a Board-approved supervisor while the license is effective; providing that a temporary license is valid until the earlier of notification of permanent licensure or 1 year after the date on which the temporary license was issued; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/31/2020
Legislative Date
10/31/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {924032/1 Adopted
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/31/2020 10/31/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Social Work Examiners – Temporary License to Practice Social Work
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {924032/1 Adopted 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Social Work Examiners – Temporary License to Practice Social Work
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 9 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:38 PM
Click to return on the top page