Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Dental Examiners to issue a cease and desist order for certain violations; increasing certain penalties for certain acts related to the unauthorized practice of dentistry or dental hygiene; authorizing the Board to levy a civil fine of not more than $50,000 for certain violations under certain circumstances; altering from a misdemeanor to a felony certain penalties for violating certain provisions of law related to dental laboratory work or advertising a dental appliance; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0947
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0365 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 5:18 PM