Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation-Related Property - Prohibited Acts and Enforcement
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting persons without lawful authority from willfully altering, disconnecting, tampering with, removing, or otherwise interfering with certain transportation-related property or an intelligent transportation system; and establishing penalties for a first offense of imprisonment not exceeding 6 months or a fine not exceeding $1,500, or both, and for a second or subsequent offense of imprisonment not exceeding 18 months or a fine not exceeding $5,000, or both.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2020
Legislative Date
9/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {447973/1 Adopted
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 9/23/2020 9/23/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Transportation–Related Property and Copper or Aluminum Items – Duties, Prohibited Acts, and Enforcement
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {447973/1 Adopted 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Transportation–Related Property and Copper or Aluminum Items – Duties, Prohibited Acts, and Enforcement
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 9 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:38 PM
Click to return on the top page