Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Special Elections - Voting by Mail
Sponsored by
Senator Forehand
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering provisions of law concerning voting by mail in special elections; authorizing the Governor, a county council, or a board of county commissioners to direct that voting by mail be utilized in specified special elections; requiring a local board of elections to mail a vote-by-mail ballot to each registered voter who is eligible to vote in a special election conducted by mail unless the voter has requested that the ballot be transmitted by other means; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0196
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0225 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {364336/1
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {364336/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-8)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {795860/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (93-45)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-9)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2013 2/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {364336/1 36
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 36
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments {364336/1 Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Third Reading Passed (37-8) 39
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 41
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments {795860/1 Report Adopted 58
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (93-45) 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendment 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (38-9) 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-501 through 9-505, 9-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM