Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to facilitate strategic planning, manage a Maryland Technology Infrastructure Fund, and coordinate economic development service delivery; requiring the Corporation, under certain circumstances, to award capital and operating financial assistance from the Fund to support certain purposes; establishing the Maryland Technology Infrastructure Authority in the Corporation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0235
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {867779/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {867779/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Text - Third - Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 65
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-401, 10-495.1 through 10-495.12, 10-496, 9-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM