Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to facilitate strategic planning, manage a Maryland Technology Infrastructure Fund, and coordinate economic development service delivery; requiring the Corporation, under certain circumstances, to award capital and operating financial assistance from the Fund to support certain purposes; establishing the Maryland Technology Infrastructure Authority in the Corporation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0235
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {867779/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Text - Third - Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 65
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-401, 10-495.1 through 10-495.12, 10-496, 9-101 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:35 AM