Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy - Annual Report - Crimes of Violence
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Hayes, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Ready, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy to report certain information for the preceding calendar year for cases involving a crime of violence disaggregated by judicial circuit to the Governor, the House Judiciary Committee and the Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee by December 1, 2019, and each December 1 thereafter.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0229
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {388678/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy - Annual Report - Crimes of Violence
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {388678/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Text - Third - State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy - Annual Report - Crimes of Violence
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59A
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 59
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-101 )
(   6-201, 6-209.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM