Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estate Tax - Filing of Tax Returns
Sponsored by
Senator Kasemeyer
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified requirements for filing specified estate tax returns so as to require them to be filed 9 months after the date of death of the decedent and with the Comptroller only.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0828
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Second Reading Passed 24
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 26
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 28
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM