Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsored by
The Minority Leader (By Request - Administration) and Senators Carozza, Bailey, Eckardt, Gallion, Hershey, Jennings, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Stadium Authority to provide for the renovation of the Ocean City Convention facility; increasing, from $17,340,000 to $24,500,000, the amount the Board of Public Works may approve for the issuance of certain bonds related to the Ocean City Convention facility without receiving authorization by the General Assembly; altering certain contribution amounts, allocations of savings, and leasehold ownership allocations that must be contained in a certain lease or other written agreement with Ocean City; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0178
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0133 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Carozza) Adopted (44-0)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed 62A
Text - Third - Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Carozza) Adopted (44-0) 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 62A
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 64
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 68
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Text - Chapter - Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-628, 10-643 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM