Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Hiring - Higher Education Requirements (Give Me a Chance Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Patterson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting an employer from developing or implementing an application or hiring process that uses a higher education degree as a certain limitation except in certain circumstances; prohibiting an employer from using an applicant's lack of a higher education degree to deny an applicant the opportunity to apply for a position except under certain circumstances; prohibiting an employer from inquiring during the interview process about an applicant's lack of a higher education degree except under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/13/2020
Legislative Date
10/13/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/13/2020 10/13/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Hiring - Higher Education Requirements (Give Me a Chance Act)
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/12/2021 12:20 PM