Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operator's Permits - Indication of Applicant's Sex
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Carter, Elfreth, Ellis, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Lee, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, Young, Zirkin, Zucker, and Kramer
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 649
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an application for a license, an identification card, or a moped operator's permit to allow an applicant to indicate the applicant's sex as female, male, or unspecified or other; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to ensure that the license, identification card, or moped operator's permit of an applicant who indicates that the applicant's sex is unspecified or other displays an "X" in the location on the license, identification card, or permit that indicates the applicant's sex; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0421
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0013 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {528170/1
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Committee Amendment {528170/1
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/20 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {528170/1 (Judicial Proceedings Committee) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-49)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 649
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operator's Permits - Indication of Applicant's Sex
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {528170/1 28
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 28
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Favorable with Amendments 29
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Committee Amendment {528170/1 29
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Motion Special Order until 2/20 (Senator Reilly) Adopted 29
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {528170/1 (Judicial Proceedings Committee) Adopted 30
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operator's Permits - Indication of Applicant's Sex
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 32
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 34
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Third Reading Passed (89-49) 45
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Returned Passed 46
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 649
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operator's Permits - Indication of Applicant's Sex
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-128, 11-135, 12-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM