Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction - Attempted Carjacking and Attempted Armed Carjacking
Sponsored by
Senator Cassilly
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the juvenile court does not have jurisdiction if a child is alleged to have committed attempted carjacking or attempted armed carjacking unless the child is under the age of 16 years or a court exercising criminal jurisdiction transfers a case to the juvenile court.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction - Attempted Carjacking and Attempted Armed Carjacking
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM