Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Solicitation and Conspiracy to Commit Murder Resulting in Death (Stacey's Law)
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Cassilly, Zirkin, Ready, Waldstreicher, Hester, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that a person who solicits another or conspires with another to commit murder in the first degree is guilty of murder in the first degree if the death of another occurs as a result of the solicitation or conspiracy.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0778 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder - Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {118372/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder - Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {372415/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder - Penalty
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {118372/1 Adopted 28
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Text - Third - Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder - Penalty
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 30
House 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Referred Judiciary 32
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {372415/1 Adopted 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Crimes - Solicitation and Conspiracy to Commit Murder Resulting in Death (Stacey's Law)
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Text - Chapter - Crimes - Solicitation and Conspiracy to Commit Murder Resulting in Death (Stacey's Law)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM