Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - No Net Loss of Forest - Definition
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Elfreth, Feldman, Hester, Lee, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Washington, West, Benson, Ellis, Guzzone, Kagan, Lam, Nathan-Pulliam, and Patterson
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the standard for achieving a no net loss of forest policy by altering the definition of "no net loss of forest" to mean that 40% of all land in Maryland is covered by forest as determined by data used in the most current Chesapeake Bay Watershed Model; and providing that the Act may not be interpreted to expand, limit, or otherwise disrupt any program conducted in accordance with the Chesapeake Bay Total Maximum Daily Load, a municipal separate storm sewer system permit, urban tree canopy goals, or any other local program.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0120
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - No Net Loss of Forest - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {814831/1
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Committee Amendment {814831/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - No Net Loss of Forest - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-13)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Natural Resources - No Net Loss of Forest - Definition
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments {814831/1 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 40
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Committee Amendment {814831/1 Adopted 41
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Natural Resources - No Net Loss of Forest - Definition
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (34-13) 43
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 44
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM