Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election Year
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the date of the statewide primary election in the year in which the President of the United States is elected; altering the date of the primary election for municipal offices in Baltimore City in the year in which the President of the United States is elected; altering the deadline from 6 to 9 days after the filing dates for filing a petition to challenge a candidate's residency; clarifying specified provisions of law concerning the filling of specified vacancies in nomination; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0396
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {494434/1
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {494434/1
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {494434/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {233822/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {943027/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {375567/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2015 2/26/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments {494434/1 32
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted 32
Senate 3/02/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments {494434/1 33
Senate 3/02/2015 3/02/2015 Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Conway) Adopted 33
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {494434/1 Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {233822/1 Adopted 34
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {943027/1 Adopted 34
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 38
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments {375567/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-1) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-309, 5-1002, 5-1003, 5-1004, 5-303, 5-305, 5-703, 5-703.1, 5-801, 6-210, 8-201, 8-502, 9-207, 9-215 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM