Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Judgeships - Circuit Court and District Court
Sponsored by
The President (By Request) and Senator Zirkin
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 749
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing from 5 to 6 the number of resident judges of the circuit court in Washington County; and increasing the number of resident judges of the District Court in certain districts.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0159
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Judgeships - Circuit Court and District Court
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {498972/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Judgeships - Circuit Court and District Court
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {522818/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Ready, Hester and Hough)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Ready, Hester and Hough)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Malone and Bartlett)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Malone and Bartlett)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {513224/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {513224/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Judgeships - Circuit Court and District Court
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 749
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Judgeships - Circuit Court and District Court
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Judgeships - Circuit Court and District Court
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {498972/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Judgeships - Circuit Court and District Court
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Judiciary 46A
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments {522818/1 Adopted 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 62A
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Ready, Hester and Hough) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Ready, Hester and Hough) 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 House Refuses Recede 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Malone and Bartlett) 67
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 House Refuses Recede 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Malone and Bartlett) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Conference Committee Report {513224/1 Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 65
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Conference Committee Report {513224/1 Adopted 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (124-0) 68
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Judgeships - Circuit Court and District Court
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 749
Text - Chapter - Judgeships - Circuit Court and District Court
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM