Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the State Collection Agency Licensing Board in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2032 the termination provisions relating to certain statutory and regulatory authority of the Board.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/22/2020
Legislative Date
9/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 9/22/2020 9/22/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Sunset Extension
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/15/2021 3:32 PM