Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, and Transfers
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Beidle, Benson, Carter, Elfreth, Feldman, Griffith, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Kramer, Lam, Patterson, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Smith, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, Washington, Young, and Zucker
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a person who is not a certain licensee may not complete a sale, rental, or transfer of a certain rifle or shotgun as a purchaser, lessee, or transferee or seller, lessor, or transferor, except under certain circumstances; requiring, before a certain sale, rental, or transfer is conducted, the seller, lessor, or transferor and purchaser, lessee, or transferee to both request that a certain licensee facilitate the sale, rental, or transfer; establishing certain penalties for violations of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0004
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0737 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary Transactions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {398179/2
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {398179/2
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {398179/2
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Committee Amendment {398179/2 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {553924/2 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {833929/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {273624/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-42)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary Transactions
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable with Amendments {398179/2 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted 39
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Favorable with Amendments {398179/2 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Smith) Adopted 40
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments {398179/2 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Committee Amendment {398179/2 Adopted 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Floor Amendment {553924/2 (Senator Smith) Adopted 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Floor Amendment {833929/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Floor Amendment {273624/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, and Transfers
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 43
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Judiciary 44
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (87-42) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-201, 5-204.1, 5-207 )
Last Updated: 10/13/2020 4:36 PM