Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary Transactions
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Beidle, Benson, Carter, Elfreth, Feldman, Griffith, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Kramer, Lam, Patterson, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Smith, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, Washington, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person who is not a certain licensee may not complete the transfer of a certain rifle or shotgun as transferor or transferee, except under certain circumstances; requiring, before a certain transfer is conducted, the transferor and transferee to meet jointly with a certain licensee and request that the licensee facilitate the transfer; requiring a licensee to take certain actions when facilitating a transfer; providing certain penalties; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0004
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0737 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary Transactions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary Transactions
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 10:57 AM